Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A., against Apolinario, Arthur, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 24, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions278 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time278 days |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: July 05, 2017Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: October 07, 2020Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: November 13, 2018Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: February 07, 2018Conversion Action
Date: December 09, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 05, 2016Complaint
Date: December 24, 2014Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: September 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name AND NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS Notice of Change of Firm Name AND NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 11/13/18Amount: 2499.34 Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 11/13/18 Amount: 2499.34 |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 11/13/18Amount: Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 11/13/18 Amount: 2,499.34 |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $362.77 Credit: $8344.71 Interest: $0 |
|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 11/13/2018 Amount: $2499.34 |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 07/05/2017Amount: $3,57 Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 07/05/2017 Amount: $3,574.33 |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $212.77 Credit: $7,347.28 Interest: $0.00 |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ Issued LOS ANGELES Issued On: 02/07/18 Amount: $3,346.77 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.