Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A., against Schyvincht, Chad M, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial492 days |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time462 days |
Request For Dismissal
Date: March 20, 2017Conversion Action
Date: March 22, 2016Conversion Action
Date: February 17, 2016Complaint
Date: December 16, 2014General Denial filed
Date: January 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION,With Prejudice Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS Conversion Hearing |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Dept: PJ COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PNCT: PRINT NOTICES FOR COURT TRIAL |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
CIV 531754 NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING 05/09/17. Document IMGDOC: CIV 531754 NOTICE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING 05/09/17. |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA. Conversion Action NS2: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA. |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action CDCS: CASE DISPO`D - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.