Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
California Servicebureau Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sipes, Michael K, against Guilles, Elsie, Guilles, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions248 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time248 days |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: September 18, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 19, 2020Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: November 01, 2016Complaint
Date: December 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of EL DORADO Issued On: 8/26/20 Amount: $7,771.10 |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 120.00 Credit: 0.00 Interest: 2,53610 |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: SAN FRANCISCOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 11/01/2016Amount: $5, Writ of Execution Return County: SAN FRANCISCO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 11/01/2016 Amount: $5,826.32 |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 606 Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 606.32, COST 120.00. |
|
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address of Attorney | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of SAN FRANCISCO Issued On: 11/01/2016 Amount: 5826.32 |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Conversion Action WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $19.46, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 --- |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150918-0485-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.