Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Equity Residentialmanagement Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert S., against Hiatt, Jack, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time455 days |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety
Date: March 07, 2016Complaint
Date: December 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED. Conversion Action NSR: NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED. |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED. Conversion Action NSR: NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED. |
|
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED. Conversion Action NSR: NON-SERVICE REPORT FILED. |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
(L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS. Complaint COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS. |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 141208-0623-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. Summons Issued / Filed S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED. |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Civil Case Cover Sheet CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.