Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
California Servicebureau, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sipes, Michael K, against Burns, Kathleen M, Burns, Mark Benton, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions254 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time254 days |
Complaint
Date: December 08, 2014Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: November 15, 2016Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: March 18, 2016Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: September 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 03/18/2016 Amount: 1745.49 |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Conversion Action WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU, INC.. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $97.07, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 --- |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 160321-0435-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,867.56 |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL K SIPES FILED Notice of Change of Address of Attorney NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL K SIPES FILED |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU, INC.. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.92, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 --- |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,717.41 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.