Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
California Servicebureau, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sipes, Michael K, against Deleon, Jocelyn Flores, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions260 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time260 days |
Complaint
Date: December 08, 2014Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: September 18, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: July 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of SANTA CLARA Issued On: 07/14/2020 Amount: $5,439.25 |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 0.00 Credit: 0.00 Interest: 1577.94 |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: SAN FRANCISCOStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 09/18/2015Amount: 385 Writ of Execution Return County: SAN FRANCISCO Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 09/18/2015 Amount: 3854.68 |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTRACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU, INC.. Notice N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTRACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU, INC.. |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 160603-0597-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU, INC.. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $8.37, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 --- |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150918-0479-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
September 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,854.68 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.