Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moore, Harvey M, against Soto, Sonny J, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
Category(06) Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions172 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time172 days |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: March 22, 2018Notice
Date: June 23, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: August 23, 2019Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: May 04, 2015Complaint
Date: December 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 3/22/18Amount: $6,742.6 Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 3/22/18 Amount: $6,742.68 |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 0 Credit: $237.00 Interest: 0 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 0.00 Credit: 237.00 Interest: 0.00 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 03/22/18 Amount: 6742.68 |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150812-0654-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA. Notice N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA. |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $6,664.68. |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,954.68 |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute INT: INTEREST IS $0.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.