Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Absolute Resolutions V Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Su, Nancy Q., against Lopez, Rosemary, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions347 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time347 days |
Complaint
Date: December 04, 2014Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: November 16, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: February 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 02/11/2016Amount: 3,180 Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 02/11/2016 Amount: 3,180.20 |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest;133.57 credit;233.08 costs; 105.00 |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS V LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.15, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 --- |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF DECL OF NANCY Q. SU REGARDING PRINCIPAL, COSTS, INTEREST AND CREDITS Proof of Service by MAIL of PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF DECL OF NANCY Q. SU REGARDING PRINCIPAL, COSTS, INTEREST AND CREDITS SERVED ON ROSEMARY LOPEZ WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 02/05/16 FILED. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF NANCY Q. SU REGARDING PRINCIPAL, COSTS, INTEREST AND CREDITS FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOL Declaration DECL: DECLARATION OF NANCY Q. SU REGARDING PRINCIPAL, COSTS, INTEREST AND CREDITS FILED BY ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS V LLC |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,180.20 |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 160211-0335-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS V LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS V LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,205.05 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.