Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Equity Residentialmanagement Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert S., against Ortega, Mario, Ortega, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions370 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time370 days |
This complaint is a limited civil case filed by Equity Residential Management LLC against Patricia Ortega and Mario Ortega. The amount demanded in the case does not exceed $10,000. The complaint alleges a breach of contract by the defendants. It stat...
Complaint
Date: December 03, 2014Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 14, 2017Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: October 13, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: July 18, 2017Conversion Action
Date: February 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION (LEVYING OFFICER'S ACTION REPORT) Writ of Execution Return RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION (LEVYING OFFICER'S ACTION REPORT) |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 733 Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 733.30, CREDIT: 595.84, COSTS: 314.00 |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 7-18-17 Amount: 4,812.00 |
|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: ALAMEDAStatus: Partially SatisfiedIssued on: 02/25/2016Amount: 4 Writ of Execution Return County: ALAMEDA Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 02/25/2016 Amount: 4843.55 |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.55 FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC Conversion Action MI: MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.55 FILED BY EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT LLC |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 160226-0646-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,843.55 |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment issued AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 160111-0268-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.