Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Td Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Michael D, against Varley, Ellen C, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions324 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time324 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: August 20, 2015Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: April 20, 2018Conversion Action
Date: December 09, 2015Complaint
Date: September 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return SAN DIEGO Writ of Execution Return SAN DIEGO |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $221.35 FILED BY TD BANK USA NA Conversion Action MI: MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $221.35 FILED BY TD BANK USA NA |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $8,767.45 |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 151210-0155-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF TD BANK USA NA WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND E Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF TD BANK USA NA WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF TD BANK USA NA FOR TD BANK USA NA |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute INT: INTEREST IS $0.00. |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY TD BANK USA NA Declaration DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY TD BANK USA NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.