Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Northern California Collectionservice, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cribb, Steven D., against Celestial Technologies Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: November 14, 2016Complaint
Date: December 31, 2013Ex Parte Application
Date: September 10, 2015Conversion Action
Date: September 10, 2015Document
Date: September 10, 2015Ex Parte Application
Date: September 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: Los AngelesStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 11/13/2015Amount: $2,54 Writ of Execution Return County: Los Angeles Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 11/13/2015 Amount: $2,545.63 |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/15/15 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT 21. |
|
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute LINE: ===================================== |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JCRB: HONORABLE ROBERT D. FOILES, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: ALEXANDRINA ORTEGA, COURT REPORTER: CINDY DEL ROSARIO Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute NOH: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute MDC: MATTER DROPPED FROM CALENDAR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.