Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Crowe, Roberto J, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2013 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions517 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time517 days |
Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Date: July 24, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: October 20, 2020Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: October 28, 2019Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: October 28, 2016Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: February 23, 2015Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: June 15, 2015Complaint
Date: September 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 10/28/20 Amount: $12,480.94 |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $40.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $4483.22 |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 10/28/19Amount: $11610. Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 10/28/19 Amount: $11610.40 |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 0.00 Credit: 0.00 Interest: 3667.68 |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 10-28-19 Amount: 11610.40 |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney PLAINTIFF - NEW ATTORNEY BRIAN WINN Substitution of Attorney PLAINTIFF - NEW ATTORNEY BRIAN WINN |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 10/28/2016Amount: 9560. Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 10/28/2016 Amount: 9560.00 |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 117 Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interest 1172.28, COST 445.00. |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 10/28/2016 Amount: 9560.00 |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED. Conversion Action WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.