Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robinson-Mcelroy, Sarah A., against Kohyar, Jila, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Joseph C. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph C. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2012 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions374 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time374 days |
Complaint
Date: August 20, 2012Declaration in Support
Date: December 17, 2018Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: February 15, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 17, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: December 17, 2018Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgment of credit
Date: December 16, 2016Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: August 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Type: SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT & DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICESigned b Order Type: SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT & DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed by: JUDGE JOSEPH C SCOTT Date Signed: 05/13/2019 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ReOpened | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING CASE Proof of Service by MAIL of STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ETC |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT Stipulation TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Received STIP TO SET ASIDE JUDMENTT SENT TO JUDGE DUBOIS FOR SINGATURE |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Vacate Judgment 02/15/2019 Motion to Vacate Judgment Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT Declaration in Support OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate JUDGMENT Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate JUDGMENT |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT Proposed Order Received ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.