Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rundquist, Andrew, against Bard, Marcos, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Nancy L. Fineman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 28, 2012 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions595 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1251 days |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 16, 2020Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: November 20, 2020Notice
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: September 16, 2020Motion to Vacate Judgment
Date: November 01, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: September 04, 2019Document
Date: December 01, 2015Declaration
Date: February 03, 2015Order
Date: April 17, 2015Document
Date: December 01, 2015Motion
Date: February 03, 2015Complaint
Date: June 28, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF RULING Notice OF RULING |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF RULING Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF RULING |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Vacate Judgment 11/20/2020 Motion to Vacate Judgment Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Emily D. Pierce in Support Thereof Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Attorney in Support Thereof |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ETC... |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Notice of Non-Appearance Pursuant to C.R.C. 3.1304(c) Notice of Non-Appearance Pursuant to C.R.C. 3.1304(c) |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Association of Counsel / Attorney Attorney: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC hereby associates wit Association of Counsel / Attorney Attorney: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC hereby associates with Attorney: EMILY D. PIERCE |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Judgment; Memorandum of Po Proposed Order Received Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Emily D. Pierce in Support Thereof |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Judgment; Me Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Emily D. Pierce in Support Thereof |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.