Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Hussain, Ahmed, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Abdelhalim, Manal, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions33 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
This complaint is a limited civil case. The amount demanded does not exceed $26,000. The plaintiff, Ahmeb Hussain, is filing a complaint against the defendant, Manal Abdelhalim. The defendant is in possession of the premises located at 566 Claimada A...
Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: December 16, 2014Notice
Date: December 16, 2014Complaint
Date: December 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150416-0317-XO DEP/ 60.00 PAYMENT |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action EOP: EXONERATE OVERPAYMENT TRUST |
|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Conversion Action WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action ECT: EXONERATE CIVIL TRUST |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150123-0210-XC DEP/ 769.14 PAYMENT |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150105-0833-CS TCI/ 769.14 PAYMENT |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 150120-0930-CS OPT/ 60.00 PAYMENT |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action DOP: OVERPAYMENT TRUST POSTED BY MANAL ABDELHALIM. |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *VODRE: RECEIPT# 150105-0790 VOIDED BY EJARA FROM SPEYR |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action VCT: VOID COURT TRUST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.