Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Equity Residentialmanagement,Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rothbard, Todd, against Gracey, Bancroft, Gracey, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Kathleen M. McKenna presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2014 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial45 days |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Equity Residential Management, LLC against Bancroft Gracey and Patricia Gracey for unlawful detainer. The plaintiff, Equity Residential Management, LLC, is a limited liability company licensed to do busines...
Conversion Action
Date: March 06, 2014Conversion Action
Date: March 20, 2014Document
Date: April 21, 2014Answer (Limited up to $10,000)
Date: February 14, 2014Complaint
Date: February 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION TO AMEND JUDGMENT, WRIT; ORDER - DENIED, FILED. Document FILED: APPLICATION TO AMEND JUDGMENT, WRIT; ORDER - DENIED, FILED. |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
First Paper Fee Paid FFP4: MOTION FEE PAID BY EQUITY RESIDENTIALMANAGEMENT,LLC. |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 140408-0732-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Conversion Action WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED Declaration DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE, FILED |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute *FEE: 140327-0488-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Hearing COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. TIME ESTIMATE: 0 DAYS 00:15 HOURS. |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: PARTIES REACHED AN AGREEMENT AT PRE TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Dept: UDS COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. TIME ESTIMATE: 0 DAYS 00:15 HOURS. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.