Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cheng, Charles, Finney, Karen Lee, Jeanette Aaronson,Trustee Of The Jeanette Aaronson Trust, Ryan D Finney, Trustees Of The Karen Lee Finney Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Oto, Mark K., against Mendoza, Glenn, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
Category(31) Limited Commercial Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice
Date: February 03, 2014Order for Posting
Date: January 17, 2014Declaration
Date: January 17, 2014Ex Parte Application
Date: January 17, 2014Complaint
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute COSTS: COSTS ARE $655.00. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $650.00. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF FINNEY AGAINST GLENN MENDOZA |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute INT: INTEREST IS $0.00. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,640.14 |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF FINNEY FOR KAREN LEE FINNEY, CHARLES CHENG, RYAN D FINNEY, TRUSTEES OF THE, JEANETTE AARONSON, TRUSTEE OF THE |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $5,335.14. |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY KAREN LEE FINNEY Declaration DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY KAREN LEE FINNEY |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 04/21/14 AS FOLLOWS: Judgment by Court JDCT: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 04/21/14 AS FOLLOWS: |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO GLENN MENDOZA FILED. Amended Request for Entry of Default ARD: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO GLENN MENDOZA FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.