Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Investment Concepts Inc, Summerridge 121 Lp, Perez, Lorena Ann, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bd & J, Pc, against Investment Concepts Inc, Liberty Landscaping, Inc, Summerridge 121 Lp, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, Mcdonough, Patrick John, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M. Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M. Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2013 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time223 days |
Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 13, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 08, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 05, 2016Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: July 15, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 16, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 23, 2015Exhibits List Filed
Date: October 20, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 01, 2013Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 31, 2013Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 23, 2013Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 31, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 10, 2015Motion Filed
Date: January 09, 2014At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 29, 2014Answer Filed
Date: August 30, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 27, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 06, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 10, 2015Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: July 25, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2015Order Filed Re:
Date: April 23, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 21, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 16, 2013Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 18, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Answer Filed
Date: August 30, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 05, 2014Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: November 12, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 06, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 17, 2013Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 14, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 23, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 05, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 21, 2015Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: December 01, 2015Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 30, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 28, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 24, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 06, 2016Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: January 31, 2013Answer Filed
Date: May 13, 2013Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 31, 2013Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 31, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 02, 2013Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 02, 2013Summons Issued on
Date: May 13, 2013Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 02, 2013Notice Imaged
Date: April 17, 2014Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 08, 2013Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 04, 2014Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 10, 2015Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 07, 2014Stipulation Filed re:
Date: July 10, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 05, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 16, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 30, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 17, 2015Stipulation Filed re:
Date: September 21, 2015Notice Sent re:
Date: January 04, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: January 04, 2016Notice of Destruction of Exhibits Mailed to Parties
Date: February 11, 2016Order for Destruction of Exhibits Signed
Date: April 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Destroyed Pursuant to Court Order EXHIBITS DESTROYED ON 04/27/16 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER FILED 04/26/16. |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS SIGNED ON 04/26/16 | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS MAILED TO PARTIES | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF LORENA ANN PEREZ |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OFF CALENDAR FILED BY LORENA ANN PEREZ. |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LIBERTY LANDSCAPING INC. |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent re: NOTICE OF ORDER RE: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL SENT. AFTER REVIEW OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL FILED ON DECEMBER 24, 2015, THE COURT SIGNS THE ORDER FIXING TIME FOR ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND SETS THE DATE OF FEBRUARY 8, 2016, 8:30 A.M. FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL/AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT DUE JANUARY 5, 2016, WITH DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVITS IN OPPOSITION DUE 10 DAYS AFTER FILING. COPY OF ORDER FIXING TIME FOR ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ATTACHED TO ABOVE NOTICE. NOTICES PRINTED |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER FIXING TIME FOR ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED |
|
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF INETENTION TO MOVE FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY LORENA ANN PEREZ. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.