Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Martinez, Carlos A, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2010 | |||
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
July 10, 2009 | |||
July 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: JUDGMENT PACKET BEING RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTY, UNPROCESSED, PER THEIR REQUEST |
|
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. AS TO CARLOS A MARTINEZ. |
|
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CARLOS A MARTINEZ FILED. |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CARLOS A MARTINEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/21/09 |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/10/09 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.