Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Vasconcellos, Jose A, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY 100216-4318-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 100216-4318-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 14300 | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT 100216-4305-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 100216-4305-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 14299 | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 2353.78 ) |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.46 | |
January 08, 2010 | |||
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE A VASCONCELLOS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE 091207-4297-CK CAN/ 220.00 PAYMT | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. FOR STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT 091207-4302-CK RSO/ 20.00 PAYMT | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT FOR: HSBC BANK NEVADA, N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE A VASCONCELLOS JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,587.32 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.