Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Eckelman, Samantha Beth, against Rotela, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2010 | |||
June 26, 2009 | |||
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 081231-2186-CK CLT/ 195.00 PAYMT | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
December 26, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.