Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee Of Fcnb- Spiegel, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica Lynn, against Anderson, Myesha L, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2010 | |||
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause Re: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 1/08/10 |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34T | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 26, 2009 | |||
April 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE RE HEARING FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF FCNB-. |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/09 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MYESHA L ANDERSON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/14/09 |
|
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 090316-3558-CS FFS/ 0.40 TSB/ 0.03 PAYMT | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 090316-3565-CS FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.