Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
First Resolution Investment Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Solis, Bryan C, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,017.32 |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $132.00. |
|
October 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 4717.58 ) 141003-1449-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 141003-1449-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 607921 |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,675.26) |
|
January 08, 2010 | |||
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 26, 2009 | |||
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT 090403-3424-CK MJF/ 15.00 PAYMT 090403-3424-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 74834 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.