Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pinnacle Credit Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Harris & Zide, against Zapata, Vivian D, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 5,009.71 ) |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY PINNACLE CREDIT SERVICES LLC FOR LA WRIT 170508-0296-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 170508-0296-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 124403 | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,177.40) |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC WITH LAW OFFICES OF HARRIS & ZIDE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PINNACLE CREDIT SERVICES LLC. | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PINNACLE CREDIT SERVICES LLC | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): WRIT CIVSS818462 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER PRIOR CONVERSATION PLEASE SUBMIT ALL OTHER WRITS AS ONE FOR PROCESSING. |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.