Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hull, Lashunda A., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jacobson & Associates, against Harding, Edward, represented by Early Maslach & Van Dueck, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with W. Robert Fawke presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time566 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2010 | |||
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: MEDIATION / CMC |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO DOC CONTROL FOR FILE BACK |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE PUT ON CALENDAR WALL |
|
March 30, 2010 |
Judge: Fawke, W Robert |
||
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: MEDIATION / CMC W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN;10435 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. CHARLETTE CRISSMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR EDWARD HARDING. - |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S38 FOR HEARING |
|
November 30, 2009 | |||
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CLERK'S CALENDAR CLERK: KIM ALLAIN NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY TIM CARPENTER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY MICHAEL COLETTI PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.