Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Atlantic Credit And Finance, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Eltman Eltman & Cooper Pc, against Ramirez, Erik B, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Solano WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SOLANO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 140703-0148-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 140703-0148-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 2689 |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Solano WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SOLANO COUNTY. ( 5142.61 ) |
|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CURTIS BARNES WITH ELTMAN ELTMAN & COOPER PC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ATLANTIC CREDIT AND FINANCE, INC. | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,543.20 | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 140225-1984-CK FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 140225-1984-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1621 | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION * FILED. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( $4100.19 ) 100810-1601-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 100810-1601-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 15136 |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.78 | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 100129-3293-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 100129-3293-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 69184 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.