Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
National Credit Acceptance Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Chea, Rathmony, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John P. Wade presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition (Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 090129-0984-CK MJF/ 15.00 PAYMT 090129-0984-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3177 | |
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event | UPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS. | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL - (LIMITED) OF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC FILED JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL - (LIMITED) OF NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC ORDERED ENTERED 10/08/08 JUDGMENT FOR: NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC JUDGMENT AGAINST: |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF ARBITRATION AWARD FILED |
|
October 07, 2008 |
Judge: Wade, John P |
||
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD JOHN P WADE PRESIDING. CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER BETTY KELLEY;3981 COURT ATTENDANT D MEJIA - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING ON |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO LEGAL RESEARCH |
|
September 15, 2008 |
Judge: Wade, John P |
||
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes STATUS HEARING ON PETITION JOHN P WADE PRESIDING. CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER BETTY KELLEY;3981 COURT ATTENDANT L RUSSELL - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL REQUESTS |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS BY MAIL ON 09/08/08 AS TO RATHMONY CHEA, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.