Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Acosta, Maria, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Reyes & Associates, P.C., against Brewer, Balda C, Doe, Elizabeth, Doe, Julieta, Does 1 To 25, Gallardo, Sofia, (total of 5) See All represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2024 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Notice of Transfer of Action and Request for Receipt Filed
Date: April 03, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: April 03, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Comment:
Date: March 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Transfer of Action and Request for Receipt Filed | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Comment: Register of Actions |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed 1/04/2024 Motion to change venue filed |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Comment: 2/27/2024 Minute order Nature of Proceedingss |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed 1/04/2024 Declaration of Daniel Rodriguez in support of defendant Blada C. Brewer |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed 10/20/2023 Declaration of Jorge H. Reyes Judge Hammock's Article regarding related cases |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Comment: 3/13/2024 Clerks Cerification of Reproduced Court records |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed 1/04/2024 Memorandum of Points & Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.