Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gurstel Law Firm P.C., against Rodriguez, Jose D, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2024 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Discover Bank against Jose D Rodriguez, also known as Jose Rodriguez. Discover Bank alleges that it provided Rodriguez with a credit account on or about October 18, 2017, with the account number ending in ************7041. ...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 02, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 02, 2024Declaration re:
Date: February 02, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 30, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2025 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Venue |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 2/2/2024 $240. Paid by check for new filing fees. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.