Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Bentzen Financial, Llc, filed a(n) Petition To Transfer Structured Settlement Payment Rights case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tanada, Stephanie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTanada, Stephanie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2023 |
CategoryPetition To Transfer Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified petition for approval of the transfer of structured settlement payment rights. The petitioner, Bentzen Financial, LLC, is seeking approval from the court for the transfer of certain structured settlement payment rights. T...
Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: November 22, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 19, 2024Notice Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 22, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Contnued Hearing for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights by and between CA Trasnferor and Bentzen Financial LLC Transferee Pursuant to California Insurance Code 10134 et esq. |
|
March 19, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: NOTICE OF HEARING - On the Court's own motion the 3/19/24 hearing is continued to 4/4/24 at 8:30am in S33 |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset the 3/19/24 hearing is continued to 4/4/24 at 8:30am in S33 |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition Filed (Civil) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.