Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
City Of Ontario, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Best Best & Krieger, against 1253 Holt Llc, Cctmo, Llc, Does 1-75, Inclusive, Ontario Property Owner, Llc, Patel, Mohammed I., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2023 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Inv Cond Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, City of Ontario, is a municipal corporation seeking to acquire certain real property through eminent domain for the construction of...
Declaration Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Motion re:
Date: November 16, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: December 22, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: December 22, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 22, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 16, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 13, 2023Complaint Eminent Domain Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: November 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
March 18, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #13611168 Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: duplicate filing . Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: Certificate of Assignment |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Filed First Amended Complaint in Eminent Domain |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 cert copy |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified Copy Purchased |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.