Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Huffman, Gene, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by The Barnes Firm I.C., against Aguirre, Milton, Does 1 To 50 Inclusive, Grapevine Intermodal, Llc.,, represented by Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury and property damage case filed by Gene Huffman against Milton Aguirre, Grapevine Intermodal, LLC., and Does 1-50. The plaintiff alleges causes of action for motor vehicle property damage, personal injury, and wrong...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 18, 2024Answer Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Declaration re:
Date: April 09, 2024Summons Issued on
Date: October 19, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 19, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 25, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed filed by defendant Grapevine Intermodel LLC |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: MORVARID AHMADI RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR STATUS PF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed (Comment) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on (Summons) | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received (Certificates) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.