Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
San Bernardino County Transportation Authority, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Woodruff & Smart, Apc, against All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest In The Property, City Of Riverside, Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Jeffries, James W, Jeffries, Sharen K, (total of 10) See All represented by Hilbert & Satterly Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2023 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Inv Cond Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the San Bernardino County Transportation Authority ("Plaintiff") in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The Plaintiff is a public agency seeking to acquire interests in real property...
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: March 28, 2024Motion re:
Date: November 13, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: March 06, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: October 11, 2023Copy of Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: February 21, 2024Document(s) Placed in File
Date: December 06, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 18, 2023Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed
Date: December 28, 2023Complaint Eminent Domain Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed
Date: December 11, 2023Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: February 16, 2024Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: February 29, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 15, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: March 04, 2024Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: April 11, 2024Notice Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Application for Order Filed re:
Date: March 06, 2024Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: February 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed Notice of Ruling and Service of Order for Prejudgment Possession (Notices) |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope # 14603475 rejected for no signatures on notice of ruling or Proof and there is no exhibit A attached. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement (Statements) |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed Newspaper San Bernardino Sun |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Application and Order for Publication of Summons or Citation: James L Johnson is not a party to the case. |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Authorizing service on Secretary of State pursuant to CCP416.10 and CPC 1702(A) |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application for Order Filed re: Authorizing service on Secretary of State pursuant to CCP416.10 and CPC 1702(A) |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed San Bernardino Sun |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order signed and Filed Order for prejudgment possession |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.