Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
P & D Restaurant Group, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Unlimited case represented by Eyerly, Dawn Britt, against Does 1-20, Inclusive, Jacobson, David, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tanada, Stephanie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2023 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, P&D Restaurant Group, Inc., is a California corporation. The defendant, David Jacobson, is an individual residing in San Bernardino County. The comp...
Summons Issued on
Date: October 02, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 02, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 02, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed Request for (Application) to Entry of Default (Requests) |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service of Summons Elec Filed Proof of Service Summons (Proof of Service) |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on DAVID JACOBSON, an individual (Summons) | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Case Initiation) |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed (Comment) | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received (Certificates) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.