Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
N.A., filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited case against County Of San Bernardino, San Bernardino County, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2023 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a Notice of Motion for a Writ of Administrative Mandamus filed by the petitioner, N.A., against the respondent, County of San Bernardino. The petitioner is represented by attorney Valerie Ross. The case number is not provided in the...
Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: September 26, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: September 26, 2023Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: September 12, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
November 27, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed Defendant San Bernardino County answers petition filed on 9/12/23 |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Rcvd via File Submit- Please submit through Efile |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.