Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Hunter, Desiree, filed a(n) Civil Rights Unlimited case represented by Pro Se, against Upland Police Department, represented by Best Best & Krieger, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Rights Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The jurisdiction of the case is either a limited civil case or an unlimited civil case, depending on the amount demanded. The plaintiff is Charisse Navarro, and the defend...
Declaration Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 01, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: November 01, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 25, 2023Request for Judicial Notice ISO Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: September 25, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 25, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 06, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice ISO Reply Filed Electronically | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically Declaration ISO Reply Filed Electronically |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Demurrer |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed PLTF'S OPPO TO DEF'S DEMURRER TO |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Michael J Thies in Support of Demurrer filed by defendant Upland Police Department on complaint |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed filed by defendant Upland Police Department on complaint fled 9/25/23 |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Keri Johnson in Support of Demurrer filed by defendant Upland Police Department on complaint |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed in Support of Demurrer filed by defendant Upland Police Department on complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.