Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Fuller, Matt, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Law Offices Of John G Wurm, against Coleman, Vickie Lynn, Does 1 Through 100, Miller, Duane, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2023 |
CategoryQuiet Title Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified complaint filed by attorney John G. Wurm on behalf of the plaintiff, Matt Fuller, in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including nuisa...
Declaration Filed
Date: September 07, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 31, 2023Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 05, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 05, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 31, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: September 05, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: September 07, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 31, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed Request to Enter Default (V.L.Coleman) (Requests) |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed Request to Enter Default (Duane Miller) (Requests) |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed Of plaintiff Matt Fulller in support of exparte application for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunctions. |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order signed and Filed Preliminary Injunction |
|
September 27, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of John G. Wurm re: Notice of Ex Parte Application |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Temporary Restraining Order Re: Preliminary Injunction |
|
September 07, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.