Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Villegas, Olga Lydia, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited case represented by Pro Se, against Aguayo, Jose Rodriguez, represented by Sahagun Law Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a summons for a legal case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The defendant, Jose Rodriguez Aguayo, is being sued by the plaintiff, Olga Lydia Villegas. The notice states that the court may decide against...
Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: June 21, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 21, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 21, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Motion re:
Date: July 27, 2023Order After Hearing Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 10, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Filed Granting Special Motion to Strike |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Order Filed Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Strike |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed as to Special Motion to Strike |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Defendant's notice of special motion to strike, memo. of points and authorities ISO motion, Proposed order, Proof of service |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed ISO Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant filed on 7/27/23 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant filed on 7/27/23 |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.