Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall Cardot Llp, against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Franco, Monique, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Kory Mathewson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2023 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Quall Cardot LLP on behalf of their client, CAVALRY SPV LLC, against Monique Franco and fictitious defendants referred to as DOES 1 through 100. The case is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardin...
Declaration re:
Date: May 23, 2024Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: July 05, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 25, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 16, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 15, 2023Complaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1))
Date: June 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 15, 2023Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 |
Department R12 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Mathewson, Kory |
||
June 17, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Regarding Order to Show Cause |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1)) | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.