Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, Hunt & Henriques, Llp, against Siordia Iii, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Capital One, N.A., against the defendant, Antonio Siordia III. The jurisdiction of the case is a limited civil case, with the amount demanded not exceeding $10,000. The plaintiff alleges caus...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 12, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 13, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Judgment by Clerk filed
Date: September 06, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $40 CHECK 01-26-24 WRIT |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment by Clerk filed | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of counsel; Interest, cost 1033, attorney fees |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.