Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
University Glen SH LLC -v- Navas et al Print
On June 08, 2023 a rule 3.740 collections -reduced filing fee limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 08, 2023
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Overview
Causes of Action
FACTS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by the law firm Mandarich Law Group, LLP on behalf of the plaintiff, University Glen SH LLC, against the defendant, Amy E Navas, and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges a breach of contract and seeks a demand of $2,29…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Jun 09, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Jun 09, 2023Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: Jun 08, 2023Declaration re:
Date: Jun 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Jun 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Jun 08, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1)) | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: venue |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $196 ck paid on 06/09/23 |