Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mauricio Perez, Ramon, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Imperial Imports, Inc., represented by Fisher & Phillips Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2023 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a representative action filed by Ramon Mauricio Perez, an aggrieved employee, and on behalf of all other aggrieved employees, under the Labor Code Private Attorneys General Act of 2004. The complaint is against Imperial Imports, Inc...
Complaint Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 14, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 15, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 13, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 13, 2023Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: September 13, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 13, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: August 16, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 03, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: August 21, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conformed Copies in the Attorney Bin - No Envelope Provided ASAP Legal |
|
October 19, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed JOINT STATEMENT RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Statements) |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Of Joshua D. Klein In support Of Defendant's Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant Imperial Imports, Inc. complaint filed 06/09/23 |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Of Maria Ramirez In support Of Defendant's Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant Imperial Imports, Inc. complaint filed 06/09/23 |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings, filed by Defendants Imperial Imports, Inc. complaint filed 06/09/23 |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed In support Of Defendant's Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant Imperial Imports, Inc. complaint filed 06/09/23 |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435 check paid 09/13/23 filing fees- motion fee waived |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Related Case: CIVSB2304458 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.