Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, Hunt & Henriques, Llp, against Salazar, Monique D, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, CITIBANK, N.A., against the defendant, MONIQUE D SALAZAR, in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case number is CIVSB 23131. The complaint alleges causes of action...
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 09, 2023Request to Enter Default Judgment Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Judgment by Clerk filed
Date: September 06, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Judgment Filed | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment by Clerk filed | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Of counsel; Interest, cost 1033, Attorney fees |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.