Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell & Hammer Apc, against Hagen, David, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Barclays Bank Delaware against David Hagen. The plaintiff, Barclays Bank Delaware, is a FDIC-insured Delaware State Bank. The defendant, David Hagen, is a natural person residing in the judicial district wh...
Complaint Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 08, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 09, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $240.00 check paid on 06/09/2023 for New Filing Fees. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.