Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Munoz, Juan Manuel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Blackstone Law, Apc, against Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Mga Entertainment, Inc, represented by Littler Mendelson, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2023 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJune 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Juan Manuel Munoz, individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees, against MGA Entertainment, Inc. and Does 1 through 25. The complaint is filed under the California Labor Code Private Attorneys Ge...
Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 03, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 22, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 06, 2024Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 12, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
June 14, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection joint stip/ordr to continue was returned because the hearing was previously continued. |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of 2/6/24 minute order. |
|
February 06, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed (Notices) | |
January 22, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
November 28, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Related Case (Notices) |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Joint Stipulation and Order to continue November 28, 2023 trial setting conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.