Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Massaro, David, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Hattis & Lukacs, against Citizens Telecommunications Company Of California Inc., Does 1-10, Inclusive, Frontier California Inc., Frontier Communications Of America, Inc., Frontier Communications Parent, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Mayer Brown Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCohn, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2023 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by David Massaro against Frontier Communications of America, Inc., Frontier Communications Parent, Inc., Citizens Telecommunications Company of California Inc., Frontier California Inc., and Defendants D...
Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 03, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 31, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Consent to Eltronic Serv and Ntc of Eltronic Serv Add Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: August 14, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 12, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Motion re:
Date: August 14, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 14, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 12, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 21, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 07, 2023Notice of Required Documents Sent
Date: May 25, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 31, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 30, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
October 16, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Notice of Verified application and verified application for an order permitting Kevin S Ranlett to appear as counsel pro hac vice for defendants Frontier Communications of America Inc. |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $500.00 check paid on 10/11/2023 for motion pro hac vice fee |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Defendant Frontier Communications Parent, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Quash |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed PLANTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed PLANTIFF'S OPPO TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECL. OF P.K. LUKACS I.S.O. PLANTIFF'S OPPO TO MOTION TO QUASH |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Joint stipulation and order continuing case management conference. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.