Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Center For Community Action And Environmental Justice, Johnson, Cynthia, Ordonez, Rogelio, Ordonez, Yolanda, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited case against City Of Rialto, Rialto City Council, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2023 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Amended Petition Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: June 02, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 23, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: June 09, 2023Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: June 02, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 09, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: June 09, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 23, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 28, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 22, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Electronically filed | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Grant Leave to File First Amended Petition for Writ of Mandate and Complaint for Declaratory Relief |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $20 cc paid 11/28/23 for stip/order atty taking straight to dept |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Leave of Court Granted for 30 days to file Amended Petition |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Electronically filed | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.