Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gastelum, Christian, Gastelum, Maria, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Smith Clinesmith, Llp, against Bay Bridge Capital Partners, Llc, California Opco, Llc, Does 1-50, Does 51-60, Flagstone Healthcare Central Llc, (total of 10) See All represented by Cross, Lisa A, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Christian Gastelum, acting as the guardian ad litem of Maria Gastelum, against several defendants including Macadamia Holdings, LLC, Providence Group, Inc., and Flagstone Healthcare Central, LLC. The complaint alleges negli...
Complaint Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 17, 2023Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: July 19, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 06, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 13, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 13, 2023Notice of Required Documents Sent
Date: May 13, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 13, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically
Date: October 30, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Mngmnt Conference Statement Filed Electronically Case Management Statement |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed PLE.Gastelum.Ps TSC Stmt.JM.10-26-23 |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $2175.00 ANSWER FEE |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Filed | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed as to 1st Amended Complaint by Defendants Upland Community Care et al |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $1305.00 check for 1st app fees (x3) |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and First Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Maria Gastelum et al |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Answer retunred; An Amended Complaint filed 6/29/2023, need to answer to that complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.