Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Clark, Pamela Mae, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Christian J Amendt, against Action Zipline, Inc., Bain, Belinda A., Does 1 To 25, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Pamela Mae Clark against Action Zipline, Inc., Belinda A. Bain, and Does 1 to 25. The complaint alleges negligence and premises liability. Pamela Mae Clark visited the premises of Action Zipline, Inc. on May 16, 2021, to pa...
Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: December 14, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 30, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 31, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 26, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2024Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2024Notice Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
March 27, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Dec of Bryan Reid in support of MSJ |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed Def Action Zipline, Inc. and Belinda A. Bains Motion for MSJ filed on 3/22/24 |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed undisputed material facts in support of def msj |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: dec of paula Vaccariello in support of msj |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Dec of Rohan J. SHahani in support of msj |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Dec of Abraham Sanchez in suppport of Def Action Ziplibe, Inc. and Belinda A. Bains MSJ |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Dec of Belinda A. Bain in support of MSJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.