Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Contreras, Ana, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Valiant Law, against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Envoy Solutions Llc, Nuci, Anthony, Waxie'S Enterprises , Llc, represented by Quarles & Brady Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2023 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Valiant Law on behalf of the plaintiff, Ana Contreras, in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The defendants in this case are WAXIE'S ENTERPRISES, LLC, ENVOY SOLUTIONS LLC, Anthony Nuci, and 20 unnam...
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 29, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration re:
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration re:
Date: October 02, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: October 18, 2023Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: July 26, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 18, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 04, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 04, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: July 10, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: October 18, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Defendants Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Submitted Matter Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute Order dated 10/18/23 |
|
October 18, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Matter taken under submission | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed Regina Vega, CSR #12612 |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
CSR Directed to Prepare Transcript of Proceedings 10/18/23 hearing - Regina Vega #12612 |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF APRIL DIAZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.